IL HB5800 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on June 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-10 - Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Attorney General Act. Provides that if an incident occurs between a police officer, or multiple police officers, and another person in which an apparent excessive amount of force was used and death occurred from that use of force, the matter shall be investigated by the Office of the Attorney General, in place of and instead of an investigation by the State's Attorney of the jurisdiction where the incident occurred. Provides that if, at the conclusion of the investigation, the Attorney General determines that the use of force by a peace officer comprised a criminal act, the Attorney General shall bring appropriate charges and prosecute the case on behalf of the people of the State. Effective immediately.
Title
ATT'Y GEN-POLICE USE OF FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-11-10 | House | First Reading |
2020-10-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-09-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-08-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2020-06-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2020-06-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 205 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
15 | 205 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5800&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5800.htm |