IL HB5769 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that, if a taxpayer must have an income that is at or below a certain amount in order to qualify for an exemption, then, for the purposes of that exemption, the term "income" does not include Social Security benefits unless expressly stated otherwise. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-SOCIAL SECURITY INCOME
Sponsors
Rep. Kay Hatcher [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. Kent Gaffney [R] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
Sen. Jason Barickman [R] | Rep. John Cavaletto [R] | Rep. Mike Bost [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jason Barickman |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kent Gaffney |
2012-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ren |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kay Hatcher |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 15-172 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-175 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-177 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 15-7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5769&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5769.htm |