IL HB5754 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0780
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that a principal endorsement shall be affixed to a Professional Educator License of any holder who, in addition to other requirements in the Code, has at least 4 total years of teaching or 4 total years of working in the capacity of school support personnel in a school under the supervision of the Illinois Department of Corrections (or in combination with other permitted schools).
Title
SCH CD-PRINCIPAL ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0780 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 2, 2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-002-000 |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21B-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |