IL HB5753 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Provides that the Board of the Regional Transportation Authority may, by a majority vote, issue a fine against any service board director or member who does not comply with the provisions of the Act. Authorizes the Board of the Regional Transportation Authority to take additional measures, determined by a majority vote of the Board, including, but not limiting to, suspension of that service board director or member or suspension of the powers of the service board.
Title
RTA-DIRECTOR COMPLIANCE FINE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-03-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5753&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB5753.htm |