IL HB5750 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Failed on November 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-28 - Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations from the School Infrastructure Fund to the State Board of Education for school district broadband expansion. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
$ISBE-BROADBAND EXPANSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 91 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-28 | House | Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Total Veto |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Vetoed |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Do Pass Appropriations II; 015-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations II |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-05-24 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 091-015-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-05-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-23 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 015-002-000 |
2018-05-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2018-05-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-05-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-001-000 |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |