IL HB5749 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor's Act. Provides that the Office of the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor and all attorneys employed by the Office may also assist State's Attorneys in the discharge of their duties on hearings in post-conviction proceedings. Provides that the Director of the Office of the State's Attorneys Appellate Prosecutor may contract for such investigators (rather than hire no more than 0 investigators) to provide investigative services in criminal cases and tax objection cases for staff counsel and county State's attorneys. Effective immediately.
Title
APPELLATE PROSECUTOR-DUTIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-1012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2012 |
2012-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 19, 2012 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 008-000-000 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-001-001 |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2012-02-22 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 210 | 4.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 210 | 7.06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |