IL HB5745 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0696
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Jury Commission Act. Provides that any nursing mother shall be excused from jury service upon request.
Title
JURY DUTY EXEMPTION-LACTATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0696 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-20 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |