IL HB5727 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that in a municipality with a population under 1,000,000 that has approved an ordinance, resolution, or vote authorizing the annexation of contiguous territory, the annexation is subject to a backdoor referendum upon the filing of a petition for a referendum containing a total number of signatures equal in number to at least 10% of the entire vote cast for all candidates for mayor or president of the annexing municipality at the last preceding general municipal election. Provides petition and referendum requirements. If the voters do not approve the annexation of the territory, provides that the municipality may not attempt to annex the territory for a period of no less than 2 years from the date it approved the ordinance, resolution, or vote authorizing the annexation of the territory. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MUNI-ANNEX BACKDOOR REFERENDUM

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseRemains in Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-09HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Cities & Villages Committee; 007-004-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Cities & Villages Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6557-1-5.4New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback