IL HB5697 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Universal Long-Term Services and Supports Trust Act. Contains only a short title provision.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

HEALTH CARE-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-23HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-05-23HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-05-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback