IL HB5696 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1063
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Bridge Program for Underrepresented Students Act. Defines terms. Provides that each public university in this State may establish a Bridge Program for underrepresented students. Specifies program requirements. Provides that a public university that establishes a Bridge Program shall, on or before September 1, 2019 and on or before September 1 of each subsequent year, publish on its website and make available to the public a report on the Program. Effective immediately.
Title
UNDERREPRESENTED STUDENTS ACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1063 |
2018-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2018 |
2018-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2018-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Higher Education; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 020-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |