IL HB5667 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-05-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
Pending: House Revenue & Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides that, in the case of qualifying expenditures related to (i) clean energy technology, (ii) waste reduction, (iii) recycling, (iv) emissions reduction, (v) environmental sustainability, or (vi) biodegradable or compostable products, the research and development credit shall be 13% (currently, 6.5%) of the qualifying expenditures. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INC TX-RESEARCH AND DEVELOP

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2020-03-12HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2020-02-18HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-18HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-14HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven Reick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback