IL HB5663 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Peace Officer and Probation Officer Firearm Training Act. Expands the definition of "peace officer" to include any child protective investigator of a Child Protective Services Unit assigned to perform the duties and responsibilities provided under the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires a child protective investigator to complete a Crisis Intervention Team training program conducted by the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board before becoming a peace officer. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires all personnel of the Department of Children and Family Services to adhere to specified Department procedures when conducting a child abuse or neglect investigation. Requires the Department to adopt policies on self-defense training for Department personnel. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of criminal threatening. Makes changes to provisions on stalking and aggravated stalking offenses. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. In provisions concerning stalking offenses, makes changes to the definitions of "course of conduct", "contact", and "stalking".
Title
CHILD PROTECTIVE INVESTIGATORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | To Criminal Administration and Enforcement Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 7.2a | New Code | See Bill Text |
50 | 710 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 710 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 710 | 4.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 12-6a | New Code | See Bill Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 112A-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5663&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5663.htm |