IL HB5632 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0791
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unemployment Insurance Act. Provides that if benefits are paid after a reversal of a determination in subsequent proceedings, the benefit charges shall be treated as if the decision had not been reversed if the benefits were paid because the employer failed to respond timely or adequately and had established a pattern of that type of failure. Imposes an additional penalty for obtaining benefits by means of a false statement or failure to disclose a material fact. Repeals certain provisions concerning the benefit wage ratio. Makes technical changes. Effective immediately.
Title
UNEMPLOY INS-ADMINISTRATIVE
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Mautino [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Pam Roth [R] |
Sen. Terry Link [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0791 |
2012-07-13 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2013 |
2012-07-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-26 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-28 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link |
2012-05-15 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2012 |
2012-04-25 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Postponed - State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2012 |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-26 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2012-03-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Labor Committee; 013-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Labor Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 405 | 1300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1402 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1501.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1503 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1506.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1506.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1506.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 1801.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 2100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 2103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 401 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 706 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 900 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 405 | 901.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |