IL HB5631 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 28-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-08-15 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Revenue Estimate Act. Provides that the General Assembly shall not enact any bill to appropriate funds within any fiscal year prior to its adoption of a joint resolution reflecting the estimate of funds available for that fiscal year as required under the Commission on Government Forecasting and Accountability Act. Effective immediately.
Title
NO FUNDS W/OUT REVENUE EST
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2016-02-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5631&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5631.htm |