IL HB5625 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Big Empties Site Act. Provides that property located in the State consisting of one or more PINs but under common ownership at the time of the application, that contains at least one vacant and unused building of specified square footage, is qualified to be designated as a Big Empties Site. Provides that a county or municipality that has adopted an ordinance designating a qualified site as a Big Empties Site shall make written application to the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity to have that site certified by the Department as a Big Empties Site. Contains procedures for certification by the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity. Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, and the Public Utilities Act to provide certain tax incentives for Big Empties Sites. Amends the Property Tax Code to provide that a taxing district may issue an abatement. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BIG EMPTIES ACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22059-222Amended CodeCitation Text
22059-222.1BNew CodeSee Bill Text
351053-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351103-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351153-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351202-5Amended CodeCitation Text
351205mNew CodeSee Bill Text
35200184.10New CodeSee Bill Text
355201Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback