IL HB5622 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act and the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services shall establish reimbursement rates that build toward livable wages for front-line personnel in residential and day programs and service coordination agencies serving persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities, including, but not limited to, intermediate care for the developmentally disabled facilities, medically complex for the developmentally disabled facilities, community-integrated living arrangements, community day services, employment, and other residential and day programs for persons with intellectual and developmental disabilities supported by State funds or funding under Title XIX of the federal Social Security Act. Provides that the Department shall increase rates and reimbursements so that by July 1, 2018 direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $13.50 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage, and by July 1, 2020, direct support persons earn a base wage of not less than $15 per hour and so that other front-line personnel earn a commensurate wage. Defines "front-line personnel". Effective immediately.
Title
FRONT-LINE PERSONNEL-BASE WAGE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 55.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.4j | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5622&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5622.htm |