IL HB5616 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Violence Reduction Funding Act of 2018. Requires the Secretary of the Department of Human Services to make grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of carrying out community-based violence reduction programs. Provides that the programs shall reflect strong community involvement and provide specified services including: (i) youth services; (ii) trauma-informed counseling services; (iii) public awareness campaigns; and (iv) job readiness training programs. Contains provisions concerning eligible activities; selection criteria; eligible entities; application requirements; and reporting requirements. Effective July 1, 2018.
Title
IL VIOLENCE REDUCTION ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5616&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5616.htm |