IL HB5612 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance and renewal of a license to sell alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of a specific school located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIQUOR-SALE NEAR SCHOOL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-001-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-001-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-04HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
23556-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback