IL HB5612 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Authorizes the issuance and renewal of a license to sell alcoholic liquor at premises located within 100 feet of a specific school located in the City of Chicago. Effective immediately.
Title
LIQUOR-SALE NEAR SCHOOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 006-001-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 6-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |