IL HB5607 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Assistance Fraud Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that the Department of Human Services or the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide a monetary award to any person who furnishes information that leads to the recovery of State or federal monies that represent benefits improperly and erroneously paid by the Department as a result of a fraudulent action. Provides that no money shall be awarded to a person who willfully participated in the reported fraudulent action or who knowingly received any amount paid for benefits obtained as a result of the reported fraudulent action. Provides that in determining the award amount, the Department shall assess the value of the information furnished by the person and award between 15% and 25% of the recovered amount.
Title
PUB AID FRAUD-REPORTERS AWARD
Sponsors
Rep. David Reis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5607&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5607.htm |