IL HB5602 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Safe Pharmaceutical Disposal Act. Provides that "unused medication" means any unopened, expired, or excess medication that has been dispensed for patient or resident care and that is in a liquid or solid form (rather than in a solid form). Makes related changes.
Title
PHARMACEUTICAL DISPOSAL-LIQUID
Sponsors
Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Sen. John Connor [D] | Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-03-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 150 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5602&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5602.htm |