IL HB5601 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $250,000 from the SBE Federal Department of Education Fund to the State Board of Education for a grant to or a contract with the Illinois Association of School Nurses to complete a study for school nursing capacity in this State. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
$ISBE-SCH NURSE STUDY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2022-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5601&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB5601.pdf |