IL HB5600 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-10)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans Affairs Act. In a provision requiring a service officer to be assigned to each field office established by the Department of Veterans' Affairs, provides that he or she must be an honorably discharged veteran from service in the Armed Forces of the United States who has served at least 2 years of military service (rather than he must be an honorably discharged veteran from service in the Armed Forces of the United States; and he must have served during a time of hostilities with a foreign country). Removes the definition for "time of hostilities with a foreign country". Removes certain conditions concerning military service and discharge. Effective immediately.
Title
DPT VET AFF-FIELD OFFICE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2016-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katherine Cloonen |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew F Skoog |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2016-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 019-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Veterans' Affairs Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |