IL HB5585 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Changes the definition of "concealed firearm" to include a stun gun carried on or about a person completely or mostly concealed from view of the public or on or about a person within a vehicle. Provides that if the applicant seeks a license for carrying a stun gun, the applicant must have instruction in the use of stun guns. Defines "stun gun".
Title
CONCEALED CARRY-STUN GUNS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-07 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
430 | 66 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5585&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB5585.htm |