IL HB5584 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. Provides that the provisions of the Act that prohibit liquor distributors and liquor manufacturers from giving anything of value to a person who has a retailer's license do not authorize the Liquor Control Commission to regulate beverage products that contain one-half of one per cent, or less, of alcohol by volume. Provides that the provisions of the Act shall not apply to any liquid or solid containing one-half of one percent, or less, of alcohol by volume.
Title
LIQUOR-NON-ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-08 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2014 |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 23, 2014 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2014 |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch |
2014-04-08 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2014-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 009-000-000 |
2014-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2014-02-27 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
235 | 5 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 6-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |