IL HB5575 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1078
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Comprehensive Licensing Information to Minimize Barriers Task Force Act. Creates the Comprehensive Licensing Information to Minimize Barriers Task Force within the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation. Adds provisions governing Task Force membership, duties, powers, and compensation. Provides that the Task Force shall meet monthly. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report to the General Assembly, the Office of Management and Budget, the Department, and the public in the form of a final report by December 1, 2023. Provides that the final report shall identify low-income and middle-income licensed occupations in the State and aggregate the information from those occupations under the occupations' respective regulatory boards overseen by the Department. Repeals the Act on December 1, 2024. Effective immediately.
Title
LICENSE INFORMATION TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1078 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date June 10, 2022 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 110-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Small Business,Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Small Business,Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-01 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Carol Ammons |
2022-03-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-03-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 25, 2022 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-006-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Small Business,Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Small Business,Tech Innovation, and Entrepreneurship Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |