IL HB5550 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that the Chicago Fire Department Joint Labor Management Committee is created with the Fire Commissioner of the City of Chicago as a member along with 7 members appointed to the Committee by the Fire Commissioner. Provides that the Committee may establish minimum guidelines and standards for: (1) all personal protective equipment for the Chicago Fire Department; and (2) the qualifications possessed by members of the Chicago Fire Department who are temporarily appointed by the Fire Commissioner having direct supervisory authority over sworn firefighters, paramedics, or emergency medical technicians of the Chicago Fire Department, including employment diversity goals that reflect the diversity of the City of Chicago. Provides that the guidelines and standards approved by the Committee are binding on the Chicago Fire Department except to the extent the guidelines or standards conflict with a collective bargaining agreement. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
CFD JOINT LABOR MGMT COMMITTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5550&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5550.htm |