IL HB5548 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Transportation Network Providers Act. Provides that a transportation network company shall implement a policy on driver-passenger identification. Provides that a transportation network company driver and transportation network company passenger shall make available in the transportation network company's digital network or software application a photograph of himself or herself. Provides that all photographs shall be the same as passport specifications. Provides that a transportation network company passenger shall register in the transportation network company's digital network or software application under his or her real name. Provides for situations where the transportation network company customer or digital network or software application user is not the passenger during any requested transportation network company's service.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DRIVER/PASSENGER IDENTITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Cybersecurity, Data Analytics, & IT Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
6255727New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback