IL HB5542 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-05 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 5 2023 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-05 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Veterans' Affairs Act. Deletes the term "no-wrong-door" in provisions regarding the system of support for service members, veterans, and their families. Removes provisions requiring the Illinois Joining Forces Foundation (Foundation) to utilize working groups when convening military and veteran support organizations and when providing policy recommendations that benefit service members, veterans, and their families. Removes provisions requiring the Foundation to facilitate the transfer of information and knowledge among Illinois Joining Forces member organizations. Makes changes to the definition of "veterans service organization". Provides that the Foundation may also include up to 18 additional voting members of the Board of Directors: 9 members to be nominated and approved by the Board of Directors according to the Foundation's bylaws, and 9 members to be nominated by the Director of Veterans' Affairs or the Director of Military Affairs. Provides that, to ensure parity, no additional nominees may be considered by the Board of Directors unless a like appointment is made by the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs, and vice versa. Provides that, in consultation with the Foundation's Board of Directors, the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs may adopt other rules deemed necessary to govern Foundation procedures (rather than the Department of Veterans' Affairs may adopt rules in consultation with the Department of Military Affairs). Permits the Foundation to receive services, including, but not limited to, contractual services, provided by either the Department of Veterans' Affairs or the Department of Military Affairs.
Title
DEPT VET AFF-JOINING FORCES
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Mattie Hunter [D] |
Sen. Javier Cervantes [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-01-05 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Motion in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-05 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-002 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Javier L Cervantes |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-01-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 4, 2023 |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 015-000-000 |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-11-30 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-10-21 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 103-000-001 |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Veterans' Affairs Committee; 009-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2805 | 37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |