IL HB5537 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes changes concerning State Board of Education actions for schools or school districts that remain on academic watch status. Removes current provisions governing the removal of school board members and the appointment of an Independent Authority. Provides for assistance to lower performing districts. Provides that the State Board has the power to direct the State Superintendent of Education to remove a school board in a district having a population of not more than 500,000. Provides that the State Board may require identified priority districts to seek accreditation through an independent accreditation organization chosen by the State Board and paid for by the State. Allows the State Board to direct the State Superintendent to remove school board members in any district in which the district is unable to obtain accreditation in whole or in part due to reasons related to school board governance. Provides that upon removal of the school board, the State Superintendent shall establish an Independent Authority. Provides that, upon establishment of an Independent Authority to operate the district, the State Superintendent shall appoint members to serve on the Independent Authority. Provides that the Independent Authority shall have all of the powers and duties of a school board and all other powers necessary to meet its responsibilities and to carry out its purposes and that may be requisite or proper for the maintenance, operation, and development of any school or schools under the jurisdiction of the Independent Authority. Sets forth provisions concerning emergency financial assistance, the suspension of school board elections, reports, assistance, the abolition of an Independent Authority, and indemnification and protection from suit. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-ST BD ED INTERVENTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-12-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-1155 |
2015-01-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-12-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-12-04 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-12-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-006-003 |
2014-12-04 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading December 2, 2014 |
2014-11-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading November 20, 2014 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-002 |
2014-11-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 4, 2014 |
2014-11-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2014-11-13 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-04-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-04-10 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 077-025-008 |
2014-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2014-04-09 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2014-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2014-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2014-04-08 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2014-04-02 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2014-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-03-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-03-19 | House | Home Rule Note Filed |
2014-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2014-03-19 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2014-03-18 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2014-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2014-03-18 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2014-03-17 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2014-03-17 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2014-03-17 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2014-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-03-14 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2014-03-14 | House | Correctional Note Filed |
2014-03-14 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-14 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2014-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2014-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25d | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25e-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25f-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25g | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.25h | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 3-14.28 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |