IL HB5530 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Licensed Activities
Pending: Senate Licensed Activities Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to Licensed Activities
Pending: Senate Licensed Activities Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:30 pm in Room 400
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Pharmacy Practice Act. In the definition of "practice of pharmacy": provides for the administration of long-acting injectables for mental health or substance use disorders (rather than injections of long-term antipsychotic medications); and removes language providing that the definition includes administration of injections of long-acting or extended-release form opioid antagonists for the treatment of a substance use disorder following the initial administration of long-acting or extended-release form opioid antagonists by a physician licensed to practice medicine in all its branches.
Title
PHARMACY PRACTICE-INJECTIONS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-18 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2024-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-11 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2024-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 85 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |