IL HB5528 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions requiring the Director of Insurance to approve specified acquisitions of control, provides that the Director shall deny the acquisition if the competence, experience, and integrity of those persons who would control the operation are such that it would not (rather than would) be in the best interests of specified individuals. In provisions concerning confidential treatment of certain information, excludes information submitted pursuant to specified provisions concerning mergers and acquisitions that is not personal financial information. Repeals duplicative provisions concerning exemptions. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CODE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 131.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 131.9a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5528&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5528.htm |