IL HB5526 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-18 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0981
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Makes kratom (including any parts of the plant Mitragyna speciosa, whether growing or not, and any compound, manufacture, salt, derivative, mixture, or preparation of that plant, including but not limited to mitragynine and 7-hydroxymitragynine) a Schedule I controlled substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CONTROLLED SUB-KRATOM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-05-22 - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-08-18HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0981
2014-08-18HouseEffective Date January 1, 2015
2014-08-18HouseGovernor Approved
2014-06-20HouseSent to the Governor
2014-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2014-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2014-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014
2014-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2014-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2014
2014-05-14SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000
2014-05-07SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2014-05-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2014-05-06SenateFirst Reading
2014-05-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2014-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2014
2014-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2014-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony
2014-04-10HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2014-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2014-04-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2014-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary; 015-000-000
2014-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
2014-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2014-04-07HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti
2014-03-27HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2014-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000
2014-03-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary
2014-02-14HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2014-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2014-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2014-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720570204Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback