IL HB5513 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Common Interest Community Association Act. Provides that the operation of a licensed day care home, as defined in the Child Care Act of 1969, in a residential dwelling, is incidental to the primary residential use of the dwelling and constitutes a valid residential use for the purpose of any community instrument. Provides that a common interest community association may not prohibit the use of a residential dwelling as a day care home unless a community instrument specifically prohibits that use. Provides that a condominium, timeshare, or cooperative is exempt from the provision.
Title
COMMON INTEREST ASSN-DAY CARE
Sponsors
Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. Constance Howard [D] | Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] |
Rep. Monique Davis [D] | Rep. Esther Golar [D] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-21 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2012-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Constance A. Howard |
2012-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sandy Cole |