IL HB5513 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1455
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Provides that any person who holds a license under the Act on the effective date of the amendatory Act must have a designated certified person in place who meets the requirements of the Act concerning designated certified persons within 180 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Specifies that a designated certified person must be a salaried, and not contractual, employee of the licensee at a business location with a valid license. Repeals grandfather clause.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLER-REQUIREMENTS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-26 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-20 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1455 | |
2010-08-20 | Effective Date August 20, 2010 | |
2010-08-20 | Governor Approved | |
2010-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-26 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 111-000-000 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert Rita | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-05-04 | Arrived in House | |
2010-05-04 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2010-05-04 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-04 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez | |
2010-05-04 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-04-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2010 | |
2010-04-23 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2010 | |
2010-04-15 | Do Pass Licensed Activities; 007-000-000 | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Licensed Activities | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-25 | First Reading | |
2010-03-24 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 | |
2010-03-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-18 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 013-000-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-09 | First Reading | |
2010-02-05 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |