IL HB5510 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-13)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides requirements concerning disclosure and review of prior authorization requirements, denial of claims or coverage by a utilization review program, and the implementation of prior authorization requirements or restrictions. Provides requirements concerning a utilization review program's obligations with respect to prior authorizations in nonurgent circumstances, urgent health care services, and emergency health care services. Provides that a utilization review program shall not require prior authorization under specified circumstances. Provides requirements concerning the length of prior authorizations. Provides that health care services are automatically deemed authorized if a utilization review program fails to comply with the requirements of the Act. Provides that the Director of Insurance may impose an administrative fine not to exceed $250,000 for violations of the Act. Defines terms. Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act to provide that an insurer that provides prescription drug benefits must comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Provides that if prior authorization for covered post-stabilization services is required by a health care plan, the plan shall comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code to provide that all managed care organizations shall comply with the requirements of the Prior Authorization Reform Act. Makes other changes. Effective January 1, 2021.
Title
PRIOR AUTHORIZATION REFORM ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2020-02-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2020-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2020-02-14 | House | Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2020-02-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 134 | 45.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 134 | 70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5.12d | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5510&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5510.htm |