IL HB5504 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Authorizes a county board, by resolution, to transfer, sell, lease, dispose of, or terminate services provided by, the county's sheltered care or nursing home facilities. Sets forth procedures concerning the adoption of the resolution and public notice. Further provides that a county may elect to continue to operate and maintain sheltered care or nursing home facilities or to continue to levy and have extended and collected any authorized tax for up to 10 years. Authorizes the county to be paid or reimbursed for operating and maintenance costs incurred, including but not limited to delays or failures of federal, State, or local payments related to the sheltered care or nursing home facilities, from general funds, fund transfers, tax or revenue anticipation notes, or other financing obligations. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTIES CD-NURSING HOMES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-21001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |