IL HB5492 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides the annual training of police chiefs must include at least one course on the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act, the Firearm Concealed Carry Act, and firearms investigations. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. In the definition of "clear and present danger" that the person demonstrates threatening physical or verbal behavior, such as violent, suicidal, or assaultive threats, actions, or other behavior, adds that it includes any act that is intended to cause or create a risk and does cause or create a risk of death or great bodily harm to one or more persons. Defines "patient" for purposes of the Act as a person who: is admitted as an in-patient or resident of a public or private mental health facility for mental health treatment under the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code as an informal admission, a voluntary admission, a minor admission, an emergency admission, or an involuntary admission; or is otherwise provided mental health treatment as an in-patient or resident by a public or private mental health facility, unless the treatment was solely for an alcohol abuse disorder and no other secondary substance abuse disorder or mental illness; or a person who voluntarily or involuntarily receives mental health treatment as an out-patient or is otherwise provided services by a public or private mental health facility, and who poses a clear and present danger to himself, herself, or to others. Permits the Department of State Police to notify the FBI if a person on the Terrorist Watchlist submits an application for a Firearm Owner's Identification Card. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FIREARMS-REVOCATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-16HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.1Amended CodeCitation Text
430653.3Amended CodeCitation Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text
430659.5Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.7Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback