IL HB5490 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-12-31 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill, except: (1) changes the statute of limitations for grooming to provide that when the victim is under 17 years of age at the time of the offense or is a person with a disability, a prosecution for grooming may be commenced within 10 years after the victim or the person with a disability attains 17 years of age; (2) changes the name of the offenses of child sexual abuse material and aggravated child sexual abuse material to child sexual abuse material and aggravated child sexual abuse material; (3) retains the Class 4 felony penalty for grooming; (4) deletes references to criminal transmission of HIV in various statutes; (5) in the definitions provisions of the Sex Offenses Article of the Criminal Code of 2012, provides that "family member" also means, if the victim is a child under 18 years of age, an accused who has resided in the household with the child continuously for at least 3 (rather than 6) months; (6) provides that a person also commits sexual exploitation of a child if in the presence or virtual presence, or both, of a child and with knowledge that a child or one whom he or she believes to be a child would view his or her acts, that person knowingly entices, coerces, or persuades a child to participate in the production of the recording or memorializing a sexual act of persons ages 18 or older; provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony for a first offense; and a Class 3 felony for a second or subsequent offense, or if the person has been previously convicted of a sex offense; and (7) amends various Acts to change references to "child pornography" to "child sexual abuse material".
Title
CRIM CD&CRIM PRO-SEX OFFENSE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-31 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Denyse Wang Stoneback |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-0.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-20.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-20.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 11-9.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 14-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 26-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 3-6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 36-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 106B-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-7.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
725 | 5 | 115-7.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |