IL HB5488 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Environment and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024
Pending: Senate Environment and Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Legacy Tree Program Task Force Act. Provides that the Legacy Tree Program Task Force shall establish recommendations to promote the identification, awareness, commemoration, and preservation of significant trees within the State. Sets forth provisions concerning the membership of the Task Force, compensation of members, support to the Task Force, and responsibilities of the Task Force. Provides that the Act is repealed on June 30, 2034.
Title
LEGACY TREES TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. Maura Hirschauer [D] | Rep. Lance Yednock [D] | Rep. Sharon Chung [D] | Rep. Cyril Nichols [D] |
Rep. Janet Yang Rohr [D] | Rep. Laura Faver Dias [D] | Sen. Karina Villa [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 087-013-000 |
2024-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sharon Chung |
2024-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2024-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 009-000-000 |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 006-003-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |