IL HB5482 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Provides that all promises, notes, bills, bonds, covenants, contracts, agreements, judgments, mortgages, or other securities or conveyances made, given, granted, drawn, or entered into between a person who is convicted of involuntary servitude, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or trafficking in persons for forced labor or services and a victim of the offense where the whole or any part of the consideration is for any money or thing of value obtained or derived from a violation of these provisions are null and void. Provides that a person who is a victim of involuntary servitude, involuntary sexual servitude of a minor, or trafficking in persons for forced labor or services may initiate a civil action to recover the property obtained by the person who committed the offense. Provides that the victim may initiate a civil action to obtain monetary damages based on the value of the property obtained by the person who committed the offense. Provides that the court or the jury, as the case may be, shall determine the amount of that property. Provides that after that determination, the court shall enter a judgment of triple the amount so determined. Provides that if the victim is a minor, the action may be initiated in the name of the minor by the State's Attorney of the county where the violation occurred.
Title
CRIM CD-HUM TRAFFICK CONTRACT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 82 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2012-05-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 25, 2012 |
2012-04-26 | Senate | To Criminal Law Subcommittee on CLEAR Compliance |
2012-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 082-032-000 |
2012-03-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 008-001-001 |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 010-000-000 |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Richard Morthland |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |