IL HB5481 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1152
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gifted and Talented Children Article of the School Code. Changes provisions concerning approval of local programs for the education of gifted and talented children to provide that a local program may be approved for funding by the State Board of Education, pursuant to a request for proposals process, if funds for that purpose are available and, beginning with the beginning of the 2010-2011 academic year, if the local program submits an application for funds that includes a comprehensive plan showing that the applicant is capable of meeting a portion of the specified requirements, showing the program elements currently in place and a timeline for implementation of other elements, and demonstrating to the satisfaction of the State Board of Education that the applicant is capable of implementing a program of gifted education consistent with the Article. Includes an established professional organization in gifted education as an entity that may submit a proposal to the State Board of Education for a grant for services and materials. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-GIFTED EDUC FUNDING
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Bassi [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Renee Kosel [R] | Rep. Jerry Mitchell [R] |
Rep. Sandra Pihos [R] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1152 | |
2010-07-21 | Effective Date July 21, 2010 | |
2010-07-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 | |
2010-04-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter | |
2010-04-29 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass Education; 010-000-000 | |
2010-04-14 | Postponed - Education | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Education | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-15 | First Reading | |
2010-03-12 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-17 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 018-000-000 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2010-02-05 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-05 | First Reading | |
2010-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Renée Kosel |