IL HB5476 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Executive Reorganization Implementation Act. Prohibits an executive order of the Governor from (i) establishing or (ii) providing for the administration or operation of a State-based health benefit exchange in Illinois.
Title
NO HEALTH REFORM BY EO
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Richard Morthland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2012-02-17 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 15 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |