IL HB5474 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Benefits Exchange Law. Provides that in no case shall the authority for establishing, administering, or operating a State-based health benefit exchange in Illinois be based upon an executive order issued by the Governor of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
HLTH BENEFITS EXCH-EXEC ORD
Sponsors
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Dwight Kay [R] |
Rep. Joe Sosnowski [R] | Rep. Richard Morthland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-06-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Evans |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5474&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB5474.htm |