IL HB5470 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Collective Bargaining Freedom and Consistent Wage Act. Provides that the authority to enact any ordinance, rule, or regulation, or in any way prohibit, restrict, or regulate the use of union security agreements between an employer and labor organization authorized under federal law vests exclusively with the General Assembly. Limits home rule powers. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from public inspection certain information collected by the Illinois Workers' Compensation Commission and the Department of Insurance. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 regarding workers' compensation fraud penalties. Amends the Workers' Compensation Act. Makes changes concerning: when an accidental injury shall not be considered to be "arising out of and in the course of employment" if the accidental injury or medical condition occurred while the claimant was traveling away from the employer's premises; the maximum compensation rate for a period of temporary total incapacity; compensation awards for injuries to the shoulder and hip; annual reports on the state of self-insurance for workers' compensation in Illinois; and other matters. Amends the Franchise Disclosure Act of 1987. Repeals the substantive provisions of the Act except for provisions concerning findings and purposes, provisions imposing fees, and saving provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
LABOR BUSINESS VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | To Workforce Reconciliation Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5470&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5470.htm |