IL HB5464 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-07 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1046
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with the following changes. Removes the amendatory provisions authorizing the Board of Higher Education to issue an order to cease and desist to an educational entity operating without authorization and to impose a penalty fee. In provisions concerning record retention requirements when an institution of higher education closes, removes provisions authorizing the Board to set a fee for processing transcript requests for records held by the Board. Makes corresponding changes. Removes the amendatory provisions concerning penalties for violating the Private College Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BOARD OF HIGHER EDUCATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1046 |
2022-06-07 | House | Effective Date June 7, 2022 |
2022-06-07 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | House | House Concurs |
2022-04-07 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Higher Education Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Higher Education Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-04 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-04-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2022-04-01 | House | Arrived in House |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 042-006-000 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2022 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Higher Education; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 4, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Higher Education |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-044-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 006-004-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |