IL HB5463 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Board of Higher Education Act and the Public Community College Act. Provides that the Board of Higher Education and the Illinois Community College Board shall require each board of trustees of public universities and community colleges in this State to establish a minimum salary for instructors that is not less than $1,333.33 per credit hour taught. Allows the minimum salary to be subject to an increase based upon a cost of living adjustment. Requires an annual report concerning compliance with minimum salary requirements. Provides that nothing in the provisions shall prevent the paying of instructors at a higher rate than the required minimum salary. Defines "public university board of trustees". Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
HIGHER ED-MINIMUM SALARY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 205 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 2-27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 805 | 8.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5463&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5463.htm |