IL HB5459 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0777
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Horse Racing Act of 1975. The following changes are effective until January 1, 2022: Provides that "Illinois conceived and foaled", as the term applies to a standardbred, includes a standardbred horse whose sire is a qualified Illinois stallion. Provides that semen from a stallion qualified for the Illinois Standardbred Breeders Fund may be transported outside the State. Removes the requirement that for a horse to qualify for an Illinois conceived and foaled race the mare must be in the State at least 30 days before foaling or remain in the State at least 30 days at the time of foaling. Removes the requirement that for a horse to qualify for an Illinois conceived and foaled race the mare must be inseminated within the State and the foal must be dropped in the State. Provides that the Director of Agriculture or his or her authorized agent shall not publish notice announcing disqualification of a stallion or his foals on the basis that the stallion owner, manager, or person associated has knowingly participated in the arrangements for transporting semen from a standardbred stallion registered under the Act out of State. Effective immediately.
Title
HORSE RACING-FOAL ELIGIBILITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0777 |
2018-08-10 | House | Effective Date August 10, 2018 |
2018-08-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-13 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 010-000-000 |
2018-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 5 | 3.31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
230 | 5 | 31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 5 | 33.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |