IL HB5450 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Retirement System Article of the Illinois Pension Code. With respect to a Section concerning reports on cost reduction, removes provisions requiring that on or before November 15th of each year, the Board of Higher Education, in conjunction with the Governor's Office of Management and Budget, prepare a report showing, on a fiscal year by fiscal year basis, the amount by which the costs associated with compensable sick leave have been reduced as a result of the termination of compensable sick leave accrual on and after January 1, 1998 by employees of higher education institutions who are participants in the System. Amends the Higher Education Veterans Service Act. In provisions concerning reporting, provides that each October 15, each public college and university shall report to the Board of Higher Education, in collaboration with the Illinois Community College Board, on the expenditures for the prior fiscal year for the programs and services related to the efforts of the public college or university in attracting, recruiting, and retaining veterans and military personnel (instead of providing that each September 1, each college and university that is required to have a Coordinator of Veterans and Military Personnel Student Services shall report to the Board of Higher Education on the fiscal impact of the programs and services related to the requirements of the Act and on the efforts of the public college or university in attracting, recruiting, and retaining veterans and military personnel). Requires the Board's report to be filed with the Executive Director of the Illinois Community College Board.
Title
BD HIGHER ED-REPORTING
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Mary Gill [D] | Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Gill |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 012-000-000 |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
110 | 49 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-158.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |