IL HB5447 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Boat Registration and Safety Act. Changes the definitions Section to put the terms in alphabetical order and changes the definitions of "motorboat" and "operate". Defines "international regulations" and "wearable U.S. Coast Guard approved personal flotation device". Makes additional changes and adds provisions in Sections concerning: personal flotation devices; navigation lights; interference with navigation; and traffic rules.
Title
BOAT SAFETY-FLOATS; NAVIGATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 45 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 4-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 5-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 45 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5447&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5447.htm |